Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Casas-Saldana Angelica, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Chang Grace Lea Esq., Ross Rose & Roston Law Offices Of, against Anderson James B., Anderson Jeffrey S., Anderson Jon M., represented by Evans & Silver, Evans William D. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Maria E. Stratton presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaria E. Stratton Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management105 days |
Filing DateMarch 24, 2015 |
CategoryQuiet Title (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time387 days |
Document:Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-03-24T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-09-08T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-06-29T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-06-29T00:00:00Document:Defendant's Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-04-17T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-09-11T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2015-04-15T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-08-12T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner
Date: 2015-11-05T00:00:00Document:Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-07-30T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-04-17T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-08-25T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: February 18, 2016Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-06-09T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-06-04T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-06-16T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-09-11T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-08-28T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-04-30T00:00:00Defendant's Demurrer
Date: 2015-04-17T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2015-06-29T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2015-03-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2015-08-25T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2015-04-30T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2015-06-16T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2015-06-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2015-04-15T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2015-04-17T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2015-06-04T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2015-06-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2015-08-12T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2015-09-11T00:00:00Order
Date: 2015-08-28T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2015-09-11T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2015-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2015-09-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: February 18, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.