Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Garza Ernesto, Garza Joaquin, Garza Xavier, Montes David As Executor Of The Estate, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Raffi & Associates Law Office Of, Rafii & Associates Pc, against Attalah Fadi, Does 1 Through 50, Jiffy Lube International Inc., Jiffy Lube International Inc. A, Kismat Enterprises Inc., (total of 10) See All represented by Firm Crest Law, Foroozandeh Majid Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Norwalk Courthouse with Robert J. Higa presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert J. Higa Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management346 days |
Filing DateNovember 17, 2014 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
Filing Court HouseNorwalk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time617 days |
Complaint
Date: 2014-11-17T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2014-12-09T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2014-11-19T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: 2014-11-19T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2014-11-19T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (RE: DOE I )
Date: 2014-12-09T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2014-12-24T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2014-12-09T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2014-12-24T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: 2014-12-24T00:00:00Summons Filed ( on First Amended Complaint )
Date: 2015-02-02T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2015-02-02T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2015-02-02T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2015-03-18T00:00:00Summons Issued
Date: 2015-02-02T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2015-03-27T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2015-02-02T00:00:00Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt (RE Summons on 1st Amended Complaint and of 1st Amended Complaint )
Date: 2015-02-25T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2015-02-25T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2015-02-02T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address (and Telephone #'s )
Date: 2015-03-18T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2015-04-20T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2015-07-28T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2015-04-20T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2015-07-28T00:00:00Declaration ( Ernesto Garza for Successor in Interest to Joaquin Garza (C.C.P. 377.32) )
Date: 2015-04-20T00:00:00Demurrer (TO PLAINTIFFS' FAC )
Date: 2015-03-27T00:00:00Declaration (Xavier Garza for Successor in Interest to Joaquin Garza (C.C.P. 377.32) )
Date: 2015-04-20T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2015-08-10T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2015-07-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2015-08-11T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2015-08-11T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; AND ORDER )
Date: 2015-08-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (ON PLTFS' EXPARTE ON 8/10/15 )
Date: 2015-08-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2015-08-11T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2015-08-21T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2015-08-21T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2015-08-21T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2015-08-12T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2015-08-21T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2015-08-21T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-08-27T00:00:00Summons Filed (Second Amended )
Date: 2015-08-21T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2015-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2015-09-09T00:00:00Order
Date: 2015-09-08T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: 2015-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2015-09-09T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-10-13T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2015-10-26T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-09-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2015-10-08T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2016-01-21T00:00:00Answer to Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2015-10-07T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-08-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2015-10-13T00:00:00Order
Date: 2015-10-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2015-10-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2015-10-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2015-10-08T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2016-07-25T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-09-22T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2016-07-25T00:00:00Notice of Appeal
Date: 2017-01-24T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2016-07-25T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2016-09-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-09-22T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2016-07-25T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2016-07-25T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2016-09-07T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2016-07-25T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2016-07-26T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2016-07-25T00:00:00Answer to Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2016-01-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2016-07-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-01-21T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2016-07-25T00:00:00Amended Notice
Date: 2016-09-06T00:00:00Opposition Points & Authorities
Date: 2016-07-25T00:00:00Notice of Appeal
Date: 2017-01-24T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-01-04T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2016-07-25T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2016-10-25T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2016-07-25T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2016-03-24T00:00:00Motion for an Order
Date: 2016-08-25T00:00:00Notice of Appeal
Date: 2017-01-24T00:00:00Ntc to Atty re Notice of Appeal
Date: January 31, 2017Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal
Date: January 31, 2017Remittitur (DCA FILED 01/02/18 )
Date: January 03, 2018Notice of Designation of Record
Date: April 07, 2017Unknown Document Type
Date: January 03, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.