Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Hawatmeh Hayel, represented by Gareeb Alexander S. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Elizabeth R. Feffer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElizabeth R. Feffer Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management137 days |
Filing DateNovember 10, 2014 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time372 days |
Stipulation
Date: 2015-03-23T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2015-01-15T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2015-02-10T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2014-11-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2014-12-22T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2015-02-11T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2015-02-03T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-03-26T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2015-08-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2014-11-13T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-07-21T00:00:00Order
Date: 2015-03-23T00:00:00Notice
Date: September 29, 2015Notice of Settlement
Date: November 04, 2015Notice of Settlement
Date: 2015-09-23T00:00:00Declaration
Date: November 12, 2015For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.