Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Office Of The General Counsel Wells Fargo, against Royal Electronic, Royal Computer Inc., Chan Howard T., Chan Howard, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with John Segal presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn Segal Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 24, 2014 |
CategoryOther Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions72 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time269 days |
Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2014-06-25T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2014-06-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2014-07-30T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2014-09-04T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: March 20, 2015Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2014-09-04T00:00:00Notice of Hearing
Date: October 03, 2014Notice of Settlement
Date: 2014-09-25T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S
Date: April 02, 2015For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.