Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Poretz Stefani C., Poretz Stefani C, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Daniels Fine Israel Schonbuch & Lebovits, against Los Angeles City Of, Does 1-50, City Of Los Angeles, represented by Michael N. Feuer City Attorney, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Torrance Courthouse with William G. Willett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam G. Willett Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 08, 2014 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Filing Court HouseTorrance Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time1016 days |
Document:Brief Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00Document:Request for Dismissal Filed by: for Defendant
Date: February 17, 2017Brief Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00Document:Witness List Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00Document:List of Exhibits Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00Request (SPECIAL JURY INTRUCTIONS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00Document:Jury Instructions Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-02-18T00:00:00Receipt Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-03-09T00:00:00Document:Brief Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00Receipt Filed by Defendant
Date: 2016-03-09T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2014-05-08T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2016-03-09T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed Filed by: N/A
Date: 2014-05-08T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-06-03T00:00:00Document:Exhibit Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-04-22T00:00:00Brief Filed by Defendant
Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00Order (PI TRIAL TRANSFER ORDER; JUDGE WILLETT, TORRANCE, DEPT. 11; -OTR ON AT 9:30 A.M. ) Filed by Court
Date: 2016-09-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-04-26 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-04-26T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-06-03T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Stefani C. Poretz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2014-06-18T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2016-09-23T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2016-09-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-02-27 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: February 27, 2017Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Defendant)
Date: 2016-09-23T00:00:00Receipt Filed by Stefani C. Poretz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-03-09T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2014-06-18T00:00:00Brief Filed by Stefani C. Poretz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00Receipt Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Defendant)
Date: 2016-02-18T00:00:00Document:Jury Instructions Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00Document:Stipulation for Continuance Filed by: for Defendant
Date: 2017-01-13T00:00:00Receipt Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-02-18T00:00:00Answer Filed by Defendant
Date: 2014-06-30T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-03-09T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-04-22T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2014-06-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Plaintiff
Date: 2014-06-18T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: for Defendant
Date: 2016-11-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-09-22 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-09-22T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Stefani C. Poretz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-04-22T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by Stefani C. Poretz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-09-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-06-02 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Jury Instructions Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Defendant)
Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00List of Witnesses Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-04-22T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-06-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Defendant
Date: 2016-11-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-09-23 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-09-23T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (RE TRIAL COUNSEL ENGAGED IN TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-06-03T00:00:00Motion in Limine Filed by Stefani C. Poretz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-04-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-11-15 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-11-15T00:00:00Stipulation for Continuance Filed by Defendant
Date: 2017-01-13T00:00:00List of Exhibits Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-09-23T00:00:00Document:List of Witnesses Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-09-24T00:00:00Summons Filed by null
Date: 2014-05-08T00:00:00Answer (CITY OF LOS ANGELES ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2014-06-30T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-06-18T00:00:00Document:Affidavit of Prejudice--Peremptory Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-09-23T00:00:00Complaint Filed by STEFANI C PORETZ (Plaintiff); Stefani C. Poretz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2014-05-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-01-17 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-09-26 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-09-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-09-14 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-09-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-04-14 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-04-14T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Defendant
Date: February 17, 2017Request Filed by Stefani C. Poretz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00Jury Instructions Filed by Defendant
Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: N/A
Date: 2014-05-08T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-12-21T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Defendant)
Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00Document:Request Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI (FSC TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-09-24T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2014-06-30T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Defendant)
Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-02-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2014-06-18T00:00:00Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI (FSC 1/21/16 TRIAL 2/08/16 )
Date: 2015-09-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-04-14 00:00:00
Date: 2016-04-14T00:00:00Request
Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00Request (SPECIAL JURY INTRUCTIONS )
Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2014-05-08T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-02-18T00:00:00List of Witnesses
Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2014-06-18T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2014-05-08T00:00:00Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI (FSC: 04-14-16 TRIAL: 04-26-16 )
Date: 2015-12-21T00:00:00Jury Instructions (JOINT PROPOSED AND DISPUTED CACI JURY INSTRUCTIONS )
Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-03-09T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2014-06-18T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2014-06-30T00:00:00Answer (CITY OF LOS ANGELES )
Date: 2014-06-30T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-03-09T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-03-09T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00List of Exhibits
Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (ELECTION NOT TO FILE AFFIDAVIT CCP 170.6 AS TO JUDGE WILLETT; )
Date: 2016-09-23T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2016-04-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-11-15 00:00:00
Date: 2016-11-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-01-17 00:00:00
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-09-23 00:00:00
Date: 2016-09-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-09-14 00:00:00
Date: 2016-09-14T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (RE TRIAL COUNSEL ENGAGED IN TRIAL )
Date: 2016-06-03T00:00:00Stipulation for Continuance
Date: 2017-01-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-09-26 00:00:00
Date: 2016-09-26T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-09-23T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-04-22T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-09-23T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2016-06-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-04-26 00:00:00
Date: 2016-04-26T00:00:00Order (PI TRIAL TRANSFER ORDER; JUDGE WILLETT, TORRANCE, DEPT. 11; -OTR ON 9/26/16 AT 9:30 A.M. )
Date: 2016-09-23T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Affidavit of Prejudice--Peremptory (PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER, JUDGE DHANIDINA, D. SO8 )
Date: 2016-09-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-09-22 00:00:00
Date: 2016-09-22T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2016-09-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-06-02 00:00:00
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-02-27 00:00:00
Date: February 27, 2017Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-11-22T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.