Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Emergency Services Restoration Inc, filed a(n) Slander,Libel,Defamation - Torts case represented by Artiano & Associates Apc, against Kirk Rochelle, represented by Broedlow Lewis Llp, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Dalila Corral Lyons presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDalila Corral Lyons Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management152 days |
Filing DateApril 30, 2014 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions811 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeSlander,Libel,Defamation |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time1120 days |
Proof of Service -
Date: February 28, 2017Complaint
Date: 2014-04-30T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2014-05-08T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2014-05-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2014-07-09 00:00:00
Date: 2014-07-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2014-06-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2014-07-07T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2014-07-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2014-07-10T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2014-07-10T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2014-08-06T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2014-08-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2014-07-10T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2014-08-06T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2014-08-28T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2014-09-04T00:00:00Objection
Date: 2014-09-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2014-09-11 00:00:00
Date: 2014-09-11T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2014-09-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2014-09-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2014-09-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2014-09-29 00:00:00
Date: 2014-09-29T00:00:00Order
Date: 2014-10-06T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2014-10-09T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2014-10-20T00:00:00Notice of Appeal
Date: 2014-12-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-08-14 00:00:00
Date: 2015-08-14T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2014-10-09T00:00:00Notice of Designation of Record
Date: 2014-12-23T00:00:00Ntc to Reptr/Mon to Prep Transcrpt
Date: 2015-01-15T00:00:00Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal
Date: 2014-12-09T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2015-09-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2015-10-13T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-08-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-01-20 00:00:00
Date: 2016-01-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-01-25 00:00:00
Date: 2016-01-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-10-14 00:00:00
Date: 2015-10-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-12-16 00:00:00
Date: 2015-12-16T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2016-03-29T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-03-29T00:00:00Unknown Document Type
Date: 2016-03-11T00:00:00Memo of Costs on Appeal
Date: 2016-03-29T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-04-07T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2016-04-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-04-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-04-25 00:00:00
Date: 2016-04-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-04-11T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-04-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-04-22 00:00:00
Date: 2016-04-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-04-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-05-02 00:00:00
Date: 2016-05-02T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-05-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-05-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-07-12 00:00:00
Date: 2016-07-12T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-05-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-05-19 00:00:00
Date: 2016-05-19T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: 2016-08-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-07-21 00:00:00
Date: 2016-07-21T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2016-07-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-09-02 00:00:00
Date: 2016-09-02T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2016-08-30T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2016-08-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-10-19 00:00:00
Date: 2016-10-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-10-24 00:00:00
Date: 2016-10-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-11-22 00:00:00
Date: 2016-11-22T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2016-11-04T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2016-11-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-11-08 00:00:00
Date: 2016-11-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-24 00:00:00
Date: May 24, 2017Minute order entered: 2017-02-28 00:00:00
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: May 24, 2017Minute order entered: 2017-01-04 00:00:00
Date: 2017-01-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-01-26 00:00:00
Date: 2017-01-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-03-30 00:00:00
Date: 2017-03-30T00:00:00Declaration
Date: May 24, 2017Minute order entered: 2016-12-14 00:00:00
Date: 2016-12-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-04-18 00:00:00
Date: 2017-04-18T00:00:00Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)
Date: 2017-05-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: June 01, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.