Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hollingsworth Louis, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case against Housekey Financial Corporation, Hsbc Mortgage Services Inc., represented by Katten Muchin Rosenman Llp, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Ruth Ann Kwan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRuth Ann Kwan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management93 days |
Filing DateSeptember 18, 2013 |
CategoryQuiet Title (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions133 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time113 days |
Notice
Date: 2013-10-03T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2013-09-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2013-10-15T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2013-10-03T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2013-09-19T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2013-10-28T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2013-12-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2014-01-09 00:00:00
Date: January 09, 2014Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2013-10-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2013-12-20 00:00:00
Date: 2013-12-20T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: January 29, 2014Notice of Ruling
Date: January 10, 2014Judgment
Date: January 29, 2014Order
Date: 2014-01-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.