Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Lee John, Lee Kathy, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Gilmore William R. Esq., against Chmbtyan Gabriel, Chmbtyan Gabriel Dismissed, Chmbtyan Petros, Chmbtyan Petros Doe 1, Does 1 - 25, (total of 5) See All represented by Doherty & Catlow Law Offices Of, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Torrance Courthouse with Cary Nishimoto presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCary Nishimoto Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2013 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions312 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseTorrance Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time872 days |
Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: July 27, 2015Summons
Date: 2013-09-13T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2013-09-13T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2013-10-24T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2013-10-24T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2013-10-24T00:00:00Answer to Complaint
Date: 2013-10-24T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2013-10-24T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (DOE 1 PETROS CHMBTYAN )
Date: 2014-03-03T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2014-03-03T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2014-04-04T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2014-04-02T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2014-04-30T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2014-04-04T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2014-06-12T00:00:00Notice (OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES )
Date: 2014-04-30T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2014-04-04T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2014-06-12T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2014-04-04T00:00:00Points and Authorities (IN SUPPORT OF PLTFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFT'S DEMURRER )
Date: 2014-06-12T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2014-07-14T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2014-07-14T00:00:00Reply/Response (TO PLTFS' OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER )
Date: 2014-07-14T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO DEFT, PETROS CHMBTYAN'S DEMURRER )
Date: 2014-06-12T00:00:00Order (RULING RE DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT, PETROS CHMBTYAN )
Date: 2014-07-22T00:00:00Order
Date: 2014-07-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2014-08-08T00:00:00Answer to Complaint
Date: 2014-08-08T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2014-09-16T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order
Date: 2014-10-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2014-09-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2014-09-22T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: 2015-01-23T00:00:00Mtn for Summary Adjud of Issues
Date: 2015-01-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2015-01-23T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2015-01-23T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (PETROS CHMBTYAN'S APPENDIX OF EXHIBITS AND EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF MSA )
Date: 2015-01-23T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2015-01-23T00:00:00Statement of Facts (IN SUPPORT OF MSA )
Date: 2015-01-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (IN SUPPORT OF MSA )
Date: 2015-01-23T00:00:00Statement of Facts (SEPARATE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS IN DISPUTE )
Date: 2015-03-27T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2015-03-27T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO DEFTS MTN FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICA- TION )
Date: 2015-03-27T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2015-03-27T00:00:00Points and Authorities (IN SUPPORT OF PLNTFS OPP TO DEFT PETROS CHMBTYAN'S MSA )
Date: 2015-03-27T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2015-03-27T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2015-04-03T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2015-04-10T00:00:00Response
Date: 2015-04-03T00:00:00Response (TO PLAINTIFFS' ADDITIONAL MATERIAL FACTS )
Date: 2015-04-03T00:00:00Reply to Opposition (TO DEFENDANT PETROS CHMBTY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION )
Date: 2015-04-03T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2015-04-27T00:00:00Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem (Rosie Samples CSR 12383 )
Date: 2015-04-10T00:00:00Motion in Limine (#1 TO PRECLUDE REFERENCE TO SETTLEMENT OF PLTF'S 1/3/2012 VEHICLE COLLISION )
Date: 2015-04-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2015-04-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine (#7 TO PRECLUDE IRRELEVANT PREJUDICIAL QUESTIONING OF EXPERT WITNESSES )
Date: 2015-04-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine (#3 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE AND WITNESSES NOT OTHERWISE DISCLOSED IN PRE TRIAL DISCOVERY )
Date: 2015-04-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine (#1 TO PRECLUDE MENTION THAT DEFTS CARRIED LIABLITY INSURANCE AT TRIAL )
Date: 2015-04-27T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO PLTF'S MIL #1 )
Date: 2015-05-06T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2015-05-06T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2015-05-12T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application (DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL; )
Date: 2015-05-12T00:00:00Opposition Document (OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE )
Date: 2015-05-12T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2015-05-12T00:00:00Request (FOR REFUND Granted Refund #: R56122 )
Date: 2015-06-12T00:00:00Request
Date: 2015-06-12T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2015-07-24T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-07-24T00:00:00Notice (OF INTENT TO USE PORTIONS OF VIDEO TAPED DEPOSITION AT TIME OF TRIAL )
Date: 2015-07-24T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) (COMPLAINT AS TO DEFT GABRIEL CHMBTYAN *ONLY* )
Date: 2015-07-27T00:00:00Order (PI TRIAL TRANSFER ORDER - CASE TRANSFERRED TO DEPT. E(TORRANCE) FOR TRIAL )
Date: 2015-07-27T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (ELECTION NOT TO FILE AFFIDAVIT OF PREJUDICE(CCP 170.6) )
Date: 2015-07-27T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2015-07-27T00:00:00Order
Date: 2015-07-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2015-07-27T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2015-07-27T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2015-07-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: February 02, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.