Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Jackson Jennifer, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case against California Hospital Medical Center, Dignity Health, represented by Fonda Watson & Croutch, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Stephen M. Moloney presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen M. Moloney Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 19, 2013 |
CategoryOther Professional Health Care Malpractice (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1093 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time1096 days |
Complaint
Date: 2013-08-19T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2013-12-05T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2013-12-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2013-11-18T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2013-12-05T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2013-12-12T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2014-01-03T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2014-01-13T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2014-04-25T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2014-06-17T00:00:00Motion for an Order
Date: 2014-04-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2014-06-30 00:00:00
Date: 2014-06-30T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2014-06-23T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2014-07-07T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2014-07-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2014-07-11 00:00:00
Date: 2014-07-11T00:00:00Order
Date: 2014-07-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2014-07-17T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2014-10-09T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2015-04-01T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2015-07-16T00:00:00Offer to Compromise
Date: 2015-06-23T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2015-07-21T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2015-07-16T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-07-23T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2015-08-03T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2015-08-07T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2015-08-07T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2015-08-07T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2015-08-07T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2015-08-07T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2015-08-07T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2015-08-07T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2015-08-07T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2015-08-07T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-08-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-08-14 00:00:00
Date: 2015-08-14T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2015-08-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-10-16 00:00:00
Date: 2015-10-16T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2015-10-14T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2016-03-24T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2016-03-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-03-16 00:00:00
Date: 2016-03-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2015-08-17T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2016-03-24T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2016-03-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-03-28 00:00:00
Date: 2016-03-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-04-04T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2016-04-29T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2016-04-29T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2016-04-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-05-05 00:00:00
Date: 2016-05-05T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-05-05T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2016-04-29T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees
Date: 2016-05-05T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2016-05-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-07-14 00:00:00
Date: 2016-07-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-07-05 00:00:00
Date: 2016-07-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-07-12 00:00:00
Date: 2016-07-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-07-22 00:00:00
Date: 2016-07-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-07-20 00:00:00
Date: 2016-07-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-07-21 00:00:00
Date: 2016-07-21T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs
Date: September 30, 2016Minute order entered: 2016-07-18 00:00:00
Date: 2016-07-18T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-07-14T00:00:00Notice of Designation of Record
Date: 2016-08-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-07-15 00:00:00
Date: 2016-07-15T00:00:00Notice of Appeal
Date: 2016-08-16T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-07-14T00:00:00Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal
Date: 2016-08-17T00:00:00Notice
Date: February 14, 2017Motion
Date: 2016-07-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-08-19 00:00:00
Date: 2016-08-19T00:00:00Designation of Record on Appeal
Date: 2016-09-06T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2016-08-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-08-16 00:00:00
Date: 2016-08-16T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed (B276891.)
Date: December 20, 2018Miscellaneous-Other
Date: April 27, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.