Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Gomez Alma, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Bakhtiar Ebby S. Esq., Shegerian & Associates Inc, against Does 1-100, Henry Mayo Newhall Memorial Hospital, represented by Abrahms Adam C. Esq., Tyson & Mendes Llp., Walasik Katrina J., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Torrance Courthouse with Cary Nishimoto presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCary Nishimoto Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management120 days |
Filing DateJune 06, 2013 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
Time To Trial1929 days |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions2009 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseTorrance Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time2283 days |
Proof of Service -
Date: September 20, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: April 25, 2018Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00Document:Notice of Change of Address Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-03-27T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Document:Motion Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-09-13T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Document:List of Witnesses Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2013-07-11T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Document:List of Witnesses Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2013-07-11T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Document:Stipulation Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Document:Motion to Quash Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed Filed by: N/A
Date: 2013-06-06T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2014-07-02T00:00:00Document:List of Exhibits Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Document:List of Exhibits Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Order Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-08-07T00:00:00Document:Exhibit List Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Document:Witness List Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Document:Affidavit of Prejudice--Peremptory Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: September 06, 2019Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-01-12T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-01-12T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-08-07T00:00:00Objection Document Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-01-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-01-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-01-12T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-01-05T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-01-12T00:00:00Objection Document (TO DECLARATIONS OF EBBY S. BAKHTIAR ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-01-21T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-01-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2014-07-02T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-04-07T00:00:00Notice of Hearing Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-08-04T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-08-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2014-08-07 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2014-08-07T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-07-29T00:00:00Supplement Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-01-22T00:00:00Order ( GRANTING EX PARTE APPL TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-01-08T00:00:00Objection Document Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-01-21T00:00:00Order Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-03-30T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-08-29T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-04-27T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2014-07-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (EX-PARTE APPLICATION ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Order Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-01-08T00:00:00Answer Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2013-08-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-01-08 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-09-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-01-06 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-01-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (AT HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-01-07T00:00:00Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-25T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2014-08-07T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-01-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-01-26 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-01-26T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Opposition Document ( TO PLTFS EX PARTE TO CONT. TRIAL DATE ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-03-30T00:00:00Declaration ( OF AMY MESSIGIAN ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-09-18T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-08-03T00:00:00Reply/Response Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-01-21T00:00:00Motion Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-13T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-07-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-09-03 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-09-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-01-08 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-01-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-19 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-01-06T00:00:00Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem ( JEANETTE COYLE ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-08-03T00:00:00Motion to Quash Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-09-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (re pltffs brief re brown hearing ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-07-30T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2015-08-03T00:00:00Opposition Points & Authorities Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-01-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Order Filed by Judge
Date: 2016-01-07T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-03-30T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-03-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-02-24 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-02-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-09-08 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-09-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Motion (TO BIFURCATE ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-09-13T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-07-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-04-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-01-07T00:00:00Objection Document Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-01-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-01-21 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-01-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-01-12 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-01-12T00:00:00Document:Motion Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-07-31T00:00:00Proof of Service (DEF'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO BIFURCATE ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00Brief-Reply (PLTFFS REPLY BRIEF RE BROWN HEARING ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-07-31T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (ON STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Order (granting ex parte to take deposition is Florida ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-03-30T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-01-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-02-24 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-02-24T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-01-13T00:00:00Response Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-07-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-04-10 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-04-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-03-30 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-03-30T00:00:00Motion Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-07-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-12-03 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-12-03T00:00:00Order Filed by Judge
Date: 2015-01-27T00:00:00Notice (OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-06-17T00:00:00Brief (pltffs brief re brown hearing ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-07-29T00:00:00Complaint Filed by ALMA GOMEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2013-06-06T00:00:00Notice of Hearing Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-08-06T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9 ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Order ( ruling on submitted matter ) Filed by Judge
Date: 2015-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-04-27T00:00:00Notice (OF FSC CONTINUANCE ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-09-25T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-09-13T00:00:00Opposition Document ((TO DEF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 AN 5) ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Motion in Limine Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-01-21T00:00:00Reply/Response Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-23 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-09 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-03 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-01-25 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-01-25T00:00:00Notice Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application ( TO AUGMENT EXPERT DESIGNATION ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Objection Document (TO DEF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Notice (SECOND AMENDED NOTICE TO PRODUCE WITNESSS AT TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-08-05 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-08-05T00:00:00Notice (OF FILING REQUESTED PROPOSED SPECIAL VERDIC FORMS ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Declaration (OF AMY MESSIGIAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR BIFURCATION ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 5 ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-06 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00List of Exhibits (SECOND AMENDED LIST OF EXHIBITS ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other ((PROPOSED) SPECIAL VERIDICTS ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Judge
Date: 2015-07-08T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-08-07T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-01-08T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-01-12T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-01-12T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-06-17T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-07-24T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2014-08-07T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-07-24T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-01-21T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-01-12T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-01-20T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-01-12T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-01-21T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2014-08-07T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Judge
Date: 2015-01-27T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-08-29T00:00:00Document:Opposition Points & Authorities Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-01-12T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-01-07T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-07-30T00:00:00Document:Brief-Opening Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-07-29T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2013-06-06T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2014-07-02T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Judge
Date: 2015-08-05T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-01-08T00:00:00Document:Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2014-10-24T00:00:00Document:Brief Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-07-29T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-03-30T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-10-31T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-01-21T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-01-05T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-01-21T00:00:00Document:Notice of Change of Address Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-04-27T00:00:00Document:Notice of Hearing Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-08-04T00:00:00Document:Supplement Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-01-22T00:00:00Document:Notice of Hearing Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-08-06T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Document:List of Exhibits Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Document:Statement of Case Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-09-18T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Document:Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-07-31T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Judge
Date: 2016-01-07T00:00:00Document:Notice of Change of Address Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-01-05T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-01-09T00:00:00Document:Affidavit of Prejudice--Peremptory Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Document:Motion Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-01-06T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Document:Brief-Reply Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-07-31T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-09-15T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Document:Motion to Quash Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-09-05T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-09-25T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-09-13T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-09-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2013-07-11T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-04-07T00:00:00Document:List of Exhibits Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Statement of Facts (SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (TO CON. TRIAL DATES AS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-01-09T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00List of Exhibits Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Order (RULING/ORDERS ) Filed by Court
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-01-09T00:00:00Statement of Facts Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-03-27T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 9 ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 8 ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Order ( GRANTING EX PARTE TO AUGMENT EXPERTS DESIGNATION ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Notice Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Notice (OF ERRATA ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Motion Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Objection Document Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (REPLY MTN FOR BIFURCATION/ OPPO MOTION IN LIMINE ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Notice (AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION FOR BIFURCATION ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Statement of the Case Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (NON OPPO TO DEF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7) ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO DEF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8 ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Order Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Motion in Limine Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO DEF'S SECOND MOTION TO BIFURCATE TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF AND ORDER ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 1 ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Objection Document Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR BIFURCATION ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 3 ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00List of Exhibits Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00List of Exhibits (TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-20 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 4 ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Objection Document (TO NOTICE OF RULING ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Opposition Document (MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 11 ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Declaration ( OF KATRINA WALASIK ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Objection Document Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Order ( GRANTING EX PARTE TO ADV TSC ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-27T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (NON OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Proof of Service (re: summons and complaint ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2013-07-30T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 11 ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 10 ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-14 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2013-09-19T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2014-08-07T00:00:00Answer Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2013-08-22T00:00:00Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2013-09-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2013-09-13T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2014-07-02T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2014-07-02T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO DEF'S MTN IN LIMINE NO. 1 ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 7 ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2014-10-24T00:00:00Notice (TO DEFENDANT TO PRODUCE WITNESSES AT TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00Document:Statement of Facts Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application (TO ADVANCE TSC ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00Document:List of Exhibits Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Stipulation Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 6 ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 4 ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Stipulation (RE: EXHIBITS AND STIPU OF FACT ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 3 ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 2 ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Motion in Limine Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 2 ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Statement of Case (JOINT ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-31T00:00:00Order Filed by Judge
Date: 2015-08-05T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 1 ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Declaration (OF AMY MESSIGIAN ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem ( FELIPE CARRILLO ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-01-06T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-04-22 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-04-22T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Order ( Ruling on submitted matter ) Filed by Judge
Date: 2015-08-05T00:00:00Motion to Quash Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-02-26 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-02-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-01-27 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-01-27T00:00:00Document:Motion for an Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Notice of Continuance (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-09-15T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2013-09-19T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2014-07-02T00:00:00Document:Supporting Docs/ P's & A's Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2014-07-02T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2013-08-22T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-01-05T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2013-09-13T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2013-07-30T00:00:00Document:Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2014-07-02T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-01-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-10-25 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-10-25T00:00:00Notice Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-06-17T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application ( TO CONT. TRIAL DATES ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-08-07T00:00:00Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2013-09-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2014-09-29 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2014-09-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2013-10-04 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2013-10-04T00:00:00Brief Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-07-29T00:00:00Order Filed by Judge
Date: 2015-07-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-01-07T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO PLTFS EX PARTE TO CONT. TRIAL DATES ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2014-08-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-01-09 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-01-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-11-12 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-01-05T00:00:00Order ( RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER ) Filed by Judge
Date: 2016-01-07T00:00:00Reply/Response Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-16 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application ( TO CONT. OSC SET 8-3-15 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-07-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-07-10 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-07-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-08-03 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-08-03T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-05-01 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-05-01T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-09-15T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-07-24T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO DEF'S MTN IN LIMINE NO. 2 ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Motion to Quash Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO PLTF EX PARTE TO ADV TSC ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (RE: MOTION FOR BIFURCATION ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-01 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-12-01T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order Filed by Clerk
Date: September 06, 2019List of Witnesses Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)]) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Defendant
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-18 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (COMPENDIUM OF FEDERAL AUTHORITIES ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-13 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-11-13T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Motion (TO BIFURCATE ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem ( MARCO NEILLY ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (AMENDED NOTICE OF RULING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 10 ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Notice (OF TRIAL SETTING AND AGREEMENT TO TOLL FIVE-YEAR RULE ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (RE MOTION FOR BIFURCATION ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Stipulation and Order ( RE MOTIONS IN LIMINE MAILED) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Minute Order ((Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Minute Order ((Jury Trial;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00List of Exhibits Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Defendant
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-13 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-20 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Motion to Quash Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Statement of Facts (SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Motion to Quash (HRG ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Notice Filed by Defendant
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (RE: TELEPHONIC CON ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Affidavit of Prejudice--Peremptory (AS TO JUDGE JAMES KADDO ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-17 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Order (TRIAL TRANSFER ORDER JUDGE NISHIMOTO, TORRANCE, DEPT. E ) Filed by Court
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Defendant
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2014-07-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2014-09-15 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2014-09-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2013-07-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2014-08-29 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2014-08-29T00:00:00Order ( GRANTING EX PARTE TO CONT. TRIAL DATES ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-08-07T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-01-05T00:00:00Brief-Reply Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-07-31T00:00:00Brief-Opening Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-07-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-06-18 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-06-18T00:00:00Declaration (OF AMY MESSIGIAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO BIFURCATE ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-09-13T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-01-05T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-07-24 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-07-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-09-14 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-09-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-07-30T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-13T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO MOTION TO BIFURCATE TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-10-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-09-04 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-09-04T00:00:00List of Witnesses Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Objection Document Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-10 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2013-06-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2013-07-11T00:00:00Notice-Case Management Conference
Date: 2013-07-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (re: summons and complaint )
Date: 2013-07-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2013-07-30T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2013-08-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2013-08-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2013-09-13T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2013-09-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2013-09-19T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2013-09-19T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2013-10-04 00:00:00
Date: 2013-10-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (RE DEFDTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJ AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS )
Date: 2014-07-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2014-07-02T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2014-07-02T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2014-07-02T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2014-07-02T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2014-07-02T00:00:00Order
Date: 2014-08-07T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO PLTFS EX PARTE TO CONT. TRIAL DATES )
Date: 2014-08-07T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application ( TO CONT. TRIAL DATES )
Date: 2014-08-07T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2014-08-07T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2014-08-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2014-08-07T00:00:00Order ( GRANTING EX PARTE TO CONT. TRIAL DATES )
Date: 2014-08-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2014-08-07 00:00:00
Date: 2014-08-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2014-08-29 00:00:00
Date: 2014-08-29T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2014-08-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2014-09-15 00:00:00
Date: 2014-09-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2014-09-29 00:00:00
Date: 2014-09-29T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2014-10-24T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2015-01-05T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2015-01-05T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application (stipulated ex parte appl FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED LIMITS PURSUANT TO CRC 3.111.(E) )
Date: 2015-01-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2015-01-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (RE: PLAINTIFF'S EXPARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE )
Date: 2015-01-07T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2015-01-08T00:00:00Order
Date: 2015-01-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-01-08 00:00:00
Date: 2015-01-08T00:00:00Order ( GRANTING EX PARTE APPL TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS )
Date: 2015-01-08T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application ( FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS (GRANTED) )
Date: 2015-01-08T00:00:00Declaration (OF ALMA GOMEZ IN SUPPORT OF PLTFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFDTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJ )
Date: 2015-01-12T00:00:00Opposition Document (PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFDT SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL ACTS )
Date: 2015-01-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-01-12 00:00:00
Date: 2015-01-12T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2015-01-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2015-01-12T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2015-01-12T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2015-01-12T00:00:00Opposition Points & Authorities
Date: 2015-01-12T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2015-01-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (re pltffs opoosition to motion for summary judgment/adj )
Date: 2015-01-12T00:00:00Objection Document (pltff evidentiary objections in support to defdts motion for summary judgment/adj )
Date: 2015-01-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2015-01-20T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2015-01-21T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2015-01-21T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2015-01-21T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2015-01-21T00:00:00Reply/Response (DEFDTS REPLY TO PLTFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT )
Date: 2015-01-21T00:00:00Reply/Response (DEFDTS REPLY SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT )
Date: 2015-01-21T00:00:00Objection Document (TO DECLARATIONS OF EBBY S. BAKHTIAR )
Date: 2015-01-21T00:00:00Supplement
Date: 2015-01-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-01-26 00:00:00
Date: 2015-01-26T00:00:00Order ( ruling on submitted matter )
Date: 2015-01-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-01-27 00:00:00
Date: 2015-01-27T00:00:00Order
Date: 2015-01-27T00:00:00Order
Date: 2015-07-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-07-10 00:00:00
Date: 2015-07-10T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2015-07-24T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application ( TO CONT. OSC SET 8-3-15 )
Date: 2015-07-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-07-24 00:00:00
Date: 2015-07-24T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2015-07-24T00:00:00Opposition Document ( TO DEFTS EX PARTE APPL TO VACATE 8-3-15 HRG )
Date: 2015-07-24T00:00:00Brief (pltffs brief re brown hearing )
Date: 2015-07-29T00:00:00Brief-Opening
Date: 2015-07-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2015-07-29T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2015-07-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (re pltffs brief re brown hearing )
Date: 2015-07-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2015-07-30T00:00:00Brief-Reply (PLTFFS REPLY BRIEF RE BROWN HEARING )
Date: 2015-07-31T00:00:00Brief-Reply
Date: 2015-07-31T00:00:00Response
Date: 2015-07-31T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2015-07-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-08-03 00:00:00
Date: 2015-08-03T00:00:00Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem ( JEANETTE COYLE )
Date: 2015-08-03T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2015-08-03T00:00:00Notice of Hearing
Date: 2015-08-04T00:00:00Notice of Hearing (continuance re motion for rextensive voir dire )
Date: 2015-08-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-08-05 00:00:00
Date: 2015-08-05T00:00:00Order ( Ruling on submitted matter )
Date: 2015-08-05T00:00:00Order
Date: 2015-08-05T00:00:00Notice of Hearing
Date: 2015-08-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-09-03 00:00:00
Date: 2015-09-03T00:00:00Notice of Hearing (being taken off calendar re motion for extensive voir dire )
Date: 2015-08-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-09-04 00:00:00
Date: 2015-09-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-09-14 00:00:00
Date: 2015-09-14T00:00:00Notice of Continuance (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE )
Date: 2015-09-15T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2015-09-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-11-12 00:00:00
Date: 2015-11-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-12-03 00:00:00
Date: 2015-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2016-01-05T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address
Date: 2016-01-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-01-06 00:00:00
Date: 2016-01-06T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2016-01-06T00:00:00Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem ( FELIPE CARRILLO )
Date: 2016-01-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-01-07T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-01-07T00:00:00Order ( RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER )
Date: 2016-01-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (AT HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT )
Date: 2016-01-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-01-08 00:00:00
Date: 2016-01-08T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2016-01-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-01-21 00:00:00
Date: 2016-01-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-02-24 00:00:00
Date: 2016-02-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-02-26 00:00:00
Date: 2016-02-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-09-08 00:00:00
Date: 2016-09-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-10-25 00:00:00
Date: 2016-10-25T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-01-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-01-09 00:00:00
Date: 2017-01-09T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (TO CON. TRIAL DATES AS )
Date: 2017-01-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (ON STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE )
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-01-25 00:00:00
Date: 2017-01-25T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-03-30T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-03-30T00:00:00Order (granting ex parte to take deposition is Florida )
Date: 2017-03-30T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-03-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-03-30 00:00:00
Date: 2017-03-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-04-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-04-10 00:00:00
Date: 2017-04-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-04-07T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2017-09-05T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2017-09-05T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-09-13T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2017-09-13T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2017-09-13T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2017-09-13T00:00:00Declaration (OF AMY MESSIGIAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO BIFURCATE )
Date: 2017-09-13T00:00:00Motion (TO BIFURCATE )
Date: 2017-09-13T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-09-18T00:00:00Notice of Continuance
Date: 2017-09-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-19 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application ( TO ADVANCE HEARING ON MTN TO BIFURCATE )
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application ( TO COMPEL DEPO OF PLTFS EXPERT WITNESS )
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Declaration (OF AMY MESSIGIAN )
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Opposition Document ( TO DEFTS EX PARTE TO ADM MTN TO BIFURCATE )
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Opposition Document ( TO PLTFS EX PARTE TO CONT. TRIAL DATE )
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Declaration ( OF AMY MESSIGIAN )
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application (TO CONT. TRIAL DATE OR COMPEL DEPO OF SUSAN ROMERO )
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Notice (TO DEFENDANT TO PRODUCE WITNESSES AT TRIAL /TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS AT TRIAL )
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (EX-PARTE APPLICATION )
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-09-25T00:00:00Notice (OF FSC CONTINUANCE )
Date: 2017-09-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-16 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-10-31T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO MOTION TO BIFURCATE TRIAL )
Date: 2017-10-31T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00Declaration (OF AMY MESSIGIAN IN SUPPORT OF REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MTN FOR BIFURCATION )
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (DEF'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO BIFURCATE )
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-13 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-01 00:00:00
Date: 2017-12-01T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address
Date: 2018-03-27T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2018-03-27T00:00:00Notice (TO DEFENDANT TO PRODUCE WITNESSES AT TRIAL )
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00Notice (OF ERRATA )
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application (to trail the trial date two weeks; declaration of Mark Lim; Exhibit )
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-20 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-03 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO DEFTS EX PARTE TO AUGMENT EXPERTS DESIGNATION )
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Order ( GRANTING EX PARTE TO ADV TSC )
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO PLTF EX PARTE TO ADV TSC )
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application ( TO AUGMENT EXPERT DESIGNATION )
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application (TO ADVANCE TSC )
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Order ( GRANTING EX PARTE TO AUGMENT EXPERTS DESIGNATION )
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF AND ORDER )
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (RE PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE THE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE )
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Objection Document (TO NOTICE OF RULING )
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (AMENDED NOTICE OF RULING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION )
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem ( MARCO NEILLY )
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-09 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Notice (OF TRIAL SETTING AND AGREEMENT TO TOLL FIVE-YEAR RULE )
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-14 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Notice (SECOND AMENDED NOTICE TO PRODUCE WITNESSS AT TRIAL )
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-23 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-02-24 00:00:00
Date: 2015-02-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-04-22 00:00:00
Date: 2015-04-22T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2015-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address
Date: 2015-04-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-05-01 00:00:00
Date: 2015-05-01T00:00:00Notice (OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE )
Date: 2015-06-17T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-06-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-06-18 00:00:00
Date: 2015-06-18T00:00:00Objection Document (TO NOTICE OF TSC AND AGREEMENT TO TOLL FIVE-YEAR RULE )
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (COMPENDIUM OF FEDERAL AUTHORITIES )
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Declaration (OF AMY MESSIGIAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR BIFURCATION )
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (RE MOTION FOR BIFURCATION )
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Motion (TO BIFURCATE )
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (ORDER DENYING DEFTS EX PARTE TO SPECIALLY SET MTN FOR BIFURCATION )
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Opposition Document ( TO DEFTS EX PARTE TO ADVAN. MOTION FOR BIFURCATION )
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Declaration ( OF KATRINA WALASIK )
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application (TO ADVANCE HEARING ON MTN FOR BIFURCATION **DENIED** )
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Notice (AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION FOR BIFURCATION )
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (REPLY MTN FOR BIFURCATION/ OPPO MOTION IN LIMINE )
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 1 )
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 4 )
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 3 )
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 2 )
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO DEF'S SECOND MOTION TO BIFURCATE TRIAL )
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Objection Document (TO DEF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE )
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Statement of Case (JOINT )
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 4 )
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 8 )
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 3 )
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00List of Witnesses
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 7 )
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00List of Exhibits
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Stipulation (RE: EXHIBITS AND STIPU OF FACT )
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Notice (OF FILING REQUESTED PROPOSED SPECIAL VERDIC FORMS )
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00List of Witnesses
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 9 )
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 10 )
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00List of Exhibits (TRIAL )
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 11 )
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 2 )
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other ((PROPOSED) SPECIAL VERIDICTS )
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 1 )
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 6 )
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 5 )
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9 )
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 )
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Opposition Document ((TO DEF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 AN 5) )
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (NON OPPO TO DEF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7) )
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO DEF'S MTN IN LIMINE NO. 1 )
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO DEF'S MTN IN LIMINE NO. 2 )
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Opposition Document (MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 11 )
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO DEF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8 )
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (NON OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 )
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 )
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 )
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 )
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR BIFURCATION )
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 10 )
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Objection Document (TO DEFENDANTS' NOTICE TO APPEAR AND PRODUCE DOCUMENTS AT TRIAL )
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00List of Exhibits
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem (RHONA REDDIX (CSR #10807) )
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-06 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem (RHONA REDDIX CSR NO. 10807 )
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Order (RULING/ORDERS )
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Statement of Facts (REPLY SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH )
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Statement of Facts (SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH )
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Statement of Facts (SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL 5/6/19 )
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-10 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Motion to Quash (HRG 5/6/19 )
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (RE: MOTION FOR BIFURCATION )
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00List of Exhibits (SECOND AMENDED LIST OF EXHIBITS )
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Stipulation and Order ( RE MOTIONS IN LIMINE MAILED)
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-13 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (RE: TELEPHONIC CON )
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00Order (TRIAL TRANSFER ORDER JUDGE NISHIMOTO, TORRANCE, DEPT. E )
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00List of Exhibits
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Affidavit of Prejudice--Peremptory (AS TO JUDGE C. EDWARD SIMPSON )
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Affidavit of Prejudice--Peremptory (AS TO JUDGE JAMES KADDO )
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Minute Order ((Jury Trial;))
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-17 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-18 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-20 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 10/10/2018)
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Minute Order ((Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)])
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)) of 03/08/2019)
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (as to the Entire Action of the Complaint)
Date: July 17, 2019Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2018-12-06T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: September 06, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.