Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Longtin Gregory, Logtin Gregory, Administrative Offices Of The Court, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Michael L. Justice, Justice Michael L. Esq., Justice Michael, Alec R. Simpson, against Luu Philip Phong, Does 1 Through 100, represented by Rubin Jay T., Jay T. Rubin, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Torrance Courthouse with Cary Nishimoto presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCary Nishimoto Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 20, 2013 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Pi/Pd/Wd (General Jurisdiction) |
Time To Trial778 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions799 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseTorrance Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeTransfrd To Lasc South District |
Case Cycle Time1008 days |
Complaint
Date: 2013-05-20T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2014-05-19T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2015-01-28T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2015-03-03T00:00:00Notice-PI Settlement Conf & Order
Date: 2014-07-25T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2014-07-25T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2014-05-02T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2013-07-12T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2013-06-07T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2014-05-02T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2013-07-16T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2014-05-07T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-03-30T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2016-01-25T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2015-06-19T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2015-06-19T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2015-07-08T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2015-06-19T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-01-25T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2015-07-22T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2015-07-14T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2015-07-14T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2015-06-19T00:00:00Order of Transfer
Date: 2016-01-25T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2015-07-28T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2016-01-25T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2015-05-08T00:00:00Affidavit of Prejudice - Premptory ( AS AGAINST JUDGE ROY PAUL )
Date: 2016-01-25T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2016-01-25T00:00:00Judgment
Date: February 22, 2016Stip & Order-use CSR
Date: 2016-01-25T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: June 02, 2016Stipulation (RE CIVIL JURY TRIAL )
Date: 2016-01-25T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2016-01-27T00:00:00Judgment
Date: February 22, 2016Judgment
Date: February 22, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.