We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Case Details

Filing Date

March 12, 2013

Last Refreshed

February 19, 2021

Filing Location

Los Angeles County, CA

Filing Court House

Santa Monica Courthouse

Judge

Gerald Rosenberg Track Judge’s New Cases

Category

Med Malpractice (Drs & Surgeons) (General Jurisdiction)

Practice Area

Torts

Matter Type

Malpractice

Matter Type

Dismissed - Other

Case Cycle Time

441 days

Time to First Dissmisal Order

315 days

Verdict

Unclassified

Parties

Defendants

Case Documents

Complaint

Date: 2013-03-12T00:00:00

Proof-Service/Summons

Date: 2013-05-02T00:00:00

Proof-Service/Summons

Date: 2013-05-02T00:00:00

OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv

Date: 2013-03-14T00:00:00

First Amended Complaint

Date: 2013-08-15T00:00:00

Case Management Statement

Date: 2013-06-10T00:00:00

Notice of Ruling

Date: 2013-06-14T00:00:00

Notice

Date: 2013-06-10T00:00:00

Defendant's Demurrer

Date: 2013-09-13T00:00:00

Motion to Strike

Date: 2013-09-13T00:00:00

Defendant's Demurrer

Date: 2013-05-24T00:00:00

Notice of Ruling

Date: 2013-07-26T00:00:00

Case Management Statement

Date: 2013-06-04T00:00:00

Motion to Strike

Date: 2013-05-24T00:00:00

Notice of Ruling

Date: 2013-06-20T00:00:00

Demand for Jury Trial

Date: 2013-06-13T00:00:00

Demurrer

Date: 2013-05-24T00:00:00

Motion to Strike

Date: 2013-05-24T00:00:00

Receipt

Date: 2013-06-10T00:00:00

Notice of Filing

Date: 2013-08-15T00:00:00

Notice

Date: 2013-07-19T00:00:00

Notice

Date: 2013-08-12T00:00:00

Defendant's Demurrer

Date: 2013-09-13T00:00:00

Notice

Date: 2013-08-23T00:00:00

Declaration

Date: 2013-05-24T00:00:00

Case Management Statement

Date: 2013-05-24T00:00:00

Declaration

Date: 2013-12-20T00:00:00

Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)

Date: 2014-01-22T00:00:00

Notice

Date: 2013-10-25T00:00:00

Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P&S

Date: 2014-02-03T00:00:00

Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)

Date: 2014-01-21T00:00:00

Motion to Strike

Date: 2013-09-13T00:00:00

Motion

Date: 2013-09-13T00:00:00

Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P&S

Date: 2014-02-03T00:00:00

Notice of Hearing on Demurrer

Date: 2013-09-13T00:00:00

Request for Dismissal

Date: May 27, 2014

Case Events

Type Description
Docket Event in Department 92
(Order to Show Cause; Vacated) -
Docket Event in Department 92
(Trial; Vacated) -
Docket Event in Department 92
Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Vacated) -
Docket Event in Department K
Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated
Docket Event in Department WEK, Gerald Rosenberg, Presiding
Status Conference - Advanced to this date & Vacated

Judge: Gerald Rosenberg

Docket Event in Department K
Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated
Docket Event Request for Dismissal (W/PREJ ENTIRE ACTION )
Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Docket Event in Department WEK, Gerald Rosenberg, Presiding
Status Conference - Advanced to this date & Vacated

Judge: Gerald Rosenberg

Docket Event Request for Dismissal
Filed by Robin Wilder (Plaintiff); Wilder, Estate of Keith (Plaintiff)
Docket Event in Department 92
Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (Hearing on Demurrer; Vacated) -
See all events

For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.