Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Tarzana Gardens Condominium Association, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Marks Leslie S. Esq., against Sarver Marsha, Quiroz Lisa; Doe 1, Quiroga Frank Jr., Ldt Investments Inc., Ketchum Blanca R., (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Mel Red Recana presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMel Red Recana Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 06, 2013 |
CategoryOther Contract (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions16 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed - Other |
Case Cycle Time97 days |
Paper file imaged and destroyed
Date: February 03, 2017Request and Entry of Dismissal (entire action without prejudice )
Date: June 11, 2013Proof-Service/Summons
Date: April 05, 2013Notice-Case Management Conference
Date: April 23, 2013Amendment to Complaint (DOE 1 LISA QUIROZ )
Date: March 22, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.