Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Shell Gerry Eugene, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case against 1-6 Doe Defendants, Costello Jim, Espinoza Elizabeth, Feinstein Leila, Holmes Jessica, (total of 6) See All represented by Sidley Austin Llp, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Samantha Jessner presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSamantha Jessner Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateFebruary 26, 2012 |
CategoryIntentional Bodily Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (E.G., Assault, Battery, Vandalism, Etc.) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions557 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeLegacy Judgment |
Case Cycle Time557 days |
Document:Judgment Filed by: Defendant
Date: September 05, 2013Document:Defendant's Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2013-04-22T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2013-05-21T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2013-06-21T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2013-06-28T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2013-05-21T00:00:00Document:Ord, Change/Amend/Correct Name Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2013-06-17T00:00:00Document:Motion to Strike Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2013-05-21T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2013-04-24T00:00:00Joinder Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2013-04-24T00:00:00Motion to Strike Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2013-05-21T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2013-04-24T00:00:00Document:Joinder Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2013-04-24T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2013-06-06T00:00:00Document:Joinder Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2013-05-09T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2013-07-01T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2012-02-26T00:00:00Document:Defendant's Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2013-04-24T00:00:00Document:Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2013-03-26T00:00:00Document:Notice-Related Cases Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2013-04-24T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2013-06-21T00:00:00Document:Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: September 11, 2013Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2013-05-21T00:00:00Notice Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2013-06-06T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2013-05-21T00:00:00Ord, Change/Amend/Correct Name Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2013-06-17T00:00:00Defendant's Demurrer Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2013-04-24T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2013-06-28T00:00:00Defendant's Demurrer Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2013-04-22T00:00:00Joinder Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2013-05-09T00:00:00Judgment Filed by Defendant
Date: 2013-09-05T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Gerry Eugene Shell (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2012-02-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2013-03-26T00:00:00Notice Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2013-04-24T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2012-02-26T00:00:00Order
Date: 2013-06-28T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2013-05-21T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2013-04-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2013-05-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2013-03-26T00:00:00Joinder
Date: 2013-04-24T00:00:00Defendant's Demurrer
Date: 2013-04-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2013-07-01T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2013-05-21T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2013-06-21T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2013-06-06T00:00:00Defendant's Demurrer
Date: 2013-04-22T00:00:00Joinder
Date: 2013-05-09T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2013-04-24T00:00:00Ord, Change/Amend/Correct Name
Date: 2013-06-17T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2013-09-05T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: September 11, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.