Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Coast To Coast Water Damage & Restoration, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Gareeb Alexander S. Esq., against Lockhart Serpina, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Richard E. Rico presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard E. Rico Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management106 days |
Filing DateMay 21, 2012 |
CategoryOther Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time400 days |
Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2013-03-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2012-05-24T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2012-07-20T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2012-05-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2012-08-31T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2012-05-30T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference filed
Date: 2013-04-02T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: May 02, 2013Request for Dismissal
Date: June 25, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.