Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Moran Erick, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case represented by Custodio Miguel A. Jr., against F.S.R. Corporation, represented by Mesriani Rodney Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Zaven V. Sinanian presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeZaven V. Sinanian Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2011 |
CategoryCivil Rights/Discrimination (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time81 days |
Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2011-10-25T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2011-09-23T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Erick Moran (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2011-09-23T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2011-11-29T00:00:00Document:OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2011-10-25T00:00:00Document:Request and Entry of Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2011-12-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2011-10-25T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Erick Moran (Plaintiff)
Date: 2011-12-13T00:00:00Answer Filed by F.S.R. Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2011-11-29T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk
Date: 2011-10-25T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2011-09-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2011-10-25T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2011-11-29T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2011-10-25T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2011-12-13T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 23 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Vacated) - Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Vacated) - |
|
February 01, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2012-02-01 00:00:00 | |
February 01, 2012 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Conference-Case Management Zaven V. Sinanian 8:32 am | |
February 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 23 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Vacated) - |
|
December 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 23 Non-Appearance Case Review (Non-Appearance (Case Review); Order of Dismissal) - Non-Appearance Case Review (Non-Appearance (Case Review); Order of Dismissal) - |
|
December 22, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2011-12-22 00:00:00 | |
December 22, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Non-Appearance (Case Review) Zaven V. Sinanian 10:30 am | |
December 22, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 23 Non-Appearance Case Review (Non-Appearance (Case Review); Order of Dismissal) - |
|
December 13, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Dispo/Manner:Dismissed - Other 81 Days |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.