Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Bank Of New York Mellon, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Marks Richard D. Esq., against Hsbc Bank Usa National Association, Eastman Adams Holdings Inc., Dishell Bella, Dishell Adam S., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Barbara M. Scheper presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarbara M. Scheper Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 29, 2011 |
CategoryOther Real Property (Not Eminent Domain, Landlord/Tenant, Foreclosure) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions54 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeLegacy Judgment |
Case Cycle Time377 days |
Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2011-08-05T00:00:00Document:Request Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: July 10, 2012Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2011-11-01T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2011-10-04T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: July 10, 2012Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2011-08-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Bank of New York Mellon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2011-08-01T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2012-05-30T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2011-07-06T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2011-12-14T00:00:00Document:Default Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: July 10, 2012Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2011-06-29T00:00:00Document:Notice of Bankruptcy Stay Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2011-12-05T00:00:00Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2011-12-07T00:00:00Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2011-10-05T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2011-10-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2011-07-06T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2011-11-03T00:00:00Document:Notice of Bankruptcy Stay Filed by: Court
Date: 2011-11-29T00:00:00Notice-Pending Action Filed by Bank of New York Mellon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2011-07-20T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Bank of New York Mellon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2011-06-29T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2012-03-12T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: July 10, 2012Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2012-07-10T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2012-05-30T00:00:00Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2011-08-22T00:00:00Document:Notice-Pending Action Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2011-07-20T00:00:00Document:Request for Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2012-07-10T00:00:00Document:List of Exhibits Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2012-07-10T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Bank of New York Mellon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2012-07-10T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Bank of New York Mellon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2012-03-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Bank of New York Mellon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2011-10-04T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Bank of New York Mellon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2011-10-27T00:00:00Default Entered Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2011-08-22T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy) Filed by Court
Date: 2011-11-29T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Bank of New York Mellon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2012-07-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Bank of New York Mellon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2011-11-01T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by Bank of New York Mellon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2012-05-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Bank of New York Mellon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2011-08-05T00:00:00Default Judgment Filed by Bank of New York Mellon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2012-07-10T00:00:00Notice Filed by Bank of New York Mellon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2012-05-30T00:00:00Default Entered Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2011-10-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Bank of New York Mellon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2012-07-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Bank of New York Mellon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2011-11-03T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy) Filed by Bank of New York Mellon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2011-12-05T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Bank of New York Mellon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2012-07-10T00:00:00Default Entered Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2011-12-07T00:00:00Request Filed by Bank of New York Mellon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2012-07-10T00:00:00Notice Filed by Bank of New York Mellon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2011-12-14T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Bank of New York Mellon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2012-07-10T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2012-03-12T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: 2011-11-29T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2011-10-27T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2011-06-29T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: 2011-12-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2011-10-04T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2011-12-14T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2011-08-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2011-08-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2011-07-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2011-08-01T00:00:00Notice-Pending Action
Date: 2011-07-20T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2011-10-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2011-11-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2011-11-03T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2011-12-07T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2012-05-30T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2012-07-10T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2012-07-10T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2012-07-10T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2012-07-10T00:00:00Request
Date: 2012-07-10T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2012-07-10T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2012-05-30T00:00:00Default Judgment
Date: 2012-07-10T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.