Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Optimus Cg Ii Ltd, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kirkland John C., against Drinks Americas Holdings Ltd., Does 1-10, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Edward A. Ferns presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEdward A. Ferns Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryOthr Breach Contr/Warr-Not Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed - Other |
Case Cycle Time13 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Paper file imaged and destroyed Filed by Clerk |
|
January 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice (OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
January 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice (OF ENTRY OF ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT CLASS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
January 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE: COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
January 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order (ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT OF CLAIMS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
January 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 69, Edward A. Ferns, Presiding Motion (ex parte is m.p.given to r.a. on 1-8-10) - Granted Judge: Edward A. Ferns |
|
January 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 69, Edward A. Ferns, Presiding Exparte proceeding - Granted in Part Judge: Edward A. Ferns |
|
January 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling (RE EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR COURT ORDER, ETC. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
January 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Ex-Parte Application (for approval of stipulation for settlement of claims ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
January 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.