Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Javahery Mehrad, Javahery Manijeh, Ben-Shmuel Jacki, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case against Ranch Hummingbird Nest, Five S Properties Ltd., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Helen I. Bendix presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHelen I. Bendix Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2009 |
CategoryIntentional Infliction Of Emotional Distress (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeLegacy Disposition Type |
Case Cycle Time48 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 18 Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
February 11, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Outgoing Transfer Filed by Clerk |
|
January 26, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION AND STIPULATION THEREFOR | |
January 26, 2010 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Filed by Five S Properties, LTD. (Defendant) |
|
January 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 18 Court Order - Held |
|
January 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
January 19, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
December 09, 2009 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. BREACH OF ORAL CONTRACT; ETC. | |
December 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Mehrad Javahery (Plaintiff); Jacki Ben-Shmuel (Plaintiff); Manijeh Javahery (Plaintiff) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.