Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ira Flora, filed a(n) Business Governance - Securities case represented by Bates David Smith, against San Francisco Medical Imaging Inc., Mamaliger Josef, Feygenberg Ruven, Does 1 - 50, represented by Lang Hanigan & Carvlho Llp, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Edward A. Ferns presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEdward A. Ferns Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 04, 2009 |
CategoryPrtnrship & Corp Governance Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaSecurities |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBusiness Governance |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed - Other |
Case Cycle Time80 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Paper file imaged and destroyed Filed by Clerk |
|
February 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 69, Edward A. Ferns, Presiding Clerical Processing - Completed Judge: Edward A. Ferns |
|
February 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE: ENTIRE ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
February 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice-Related Cases (W/BC382460 (Dept. 61) ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
February 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Answer to Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
January 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof-Service/Summons (COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
January 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof-Service/Summons (COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
December 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
December 04, 2009 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.