Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sinitzyn Herman, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Rothman Jay S. Esq., against Lb Property Management Inc., Does 1 Through 50, represented by Mcandrew Stephen F. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Helen I. Bendix presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHelen I. Bendix Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2009 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed - Other |
Case Cycle Time116 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Paper file imaged and destroyed Filed by Clerk |
|
April 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 18, Helen I. Bendix, Presiding Clerical Processing - Completed Judge: Helen I. Bendix |
|
April 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 35, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding Order Re: Reassignment of Case - Hearing prev advanced & vacated Judge: Daniel J. Buckley |
|
March 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
Request and Entry of Dismissal (with Prejudice- Entire action of all parties and all causes of action ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 25, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by Clerk |
|
March 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
February 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Conference Date Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
January 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof-Service/Summons (& Complaint ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
January 11, 2010 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
December 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.