Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Eott Maie Avenue Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Rosenthal Lisa F. Esq., against Does 1 To 10, Lee Ji, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Helen I. Bendix presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHelen I. Bendix Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateNovember 16, 2009 |
CategoryUd/Commercial (Not Drugs/Evict) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions16 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed - Other |
Case Cycle Time60 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Paper file imaged and destroyed Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
November 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Paper file imaged and destroyed Filed by Clerk |
|
January 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 18, Helen I. Bendix, Presiding Order to Show Cause (RE: ENTRY OF DEAFAULT JUDGMENT) - Hearing prev advanced & vacated Order to Show Cause (RE: ENTRY OF DEAFAULT JUDGMENT) - Hearing prev advanced & vacated Judge: Helen I. Bendix |
|
January 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 18, Helen I. Bendix, Presiding Order to Show Cause (RE: ENTRY OF DEAFAULT JUDGMENT) - Hearing prev advanced & vacated Judge: Helen I. Bendix |
|
January 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 18, Helen I. Bendix, Presiding Court Order - Completed Court Order - Completed Judge: Helen I. Bendix |
|
January 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 18, Helen I. Bendix, Presiding Court Order - Completed Judge: Helen I. Bendix |
|
January 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Request and Entry of Dismissal (without Prejudice- Entire action of all parties and all causes of action ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
January 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Request and Entry of Dismissal (without Prejudice- Entire action of all parties and all causes of action ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
December 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
in Department 18, Helen I. Bendix, Presiding Trial Setting Conference - Court makes order Trial Setting Conference - Court makes order Judge: Helen I. Bendix |
|
December 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
in Department 18, Helen I. Bendix, Presiding Trial Setting Conference - Court makes order Judge: Helen I. Bendix |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.