Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Navid Navizadeh M.D. Inc., Navizadeh Navid M.D., filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case against Abrahamse Shawn, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cja And Associates Inc., Evenson George, Metlife Life And Annuity Company Of, (total of 6) See All represented by Barger & Wolen Llp, Sedgwick Detert Moran & Arnold Llp, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Edward A. Ferns presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEdward A. Ferns Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management140 days |
Filing DateNovember 13, 2009 |
CategoryContractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDeemed Complete (No Remand From Federal Court) |
Case Cycle Time63 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
OSC-Failure to File Default Judg Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
February 15, 2012 | Docket Event | Document:OSC-Failure to File Default Judg Filed by: Clerk | |
February 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
OSC-Failure to File Default Judg Filed by Clerk |
|
September 09, 2010 | Docket Event | Special Status End:Removed to Federal Court | |
September 09, 2010 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2010-09-09 00:00:00 | |
September 09, 2010 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Non-Appearance (Case Review) Ramona G. See 8:30 am | |
September 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 Non-Appearance Case Review (Non-Appearance (Case Review); Off Calendar) - Non-Appearance Case Review (Non-Appearance (Case Review); Off Calendar) - |
|
September 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 Non-Appearance Case Review (Non-Appearance (Case Review); Off Calendar) - |
|
August 31, 2010 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2010-08-31 00:00:00 | |
August 31, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 (Order to Show Cause; Vacated) - (Order to Show Cause; Vacated) - |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.