Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Pacific City Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by An Troy S. Esq., against Does 1 Through 100, Kim Jae Ryong, Mr. Coffee House Inc., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Helen I. Bendix presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHelen I. Bendix Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateNovember 10, 2009 |
CategoryOther Promissory Note/Collections (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions56 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed - Other |
Case Cycle Time119 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Paper file imaged and destroyed Filed by Clerk |
|
March 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 18, Helen I. Bendix, Presiding Conference-Case Management - Off Calendar Judge: Helen I. Bendix |
|
March 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Request and Entry of Dismissal (without Prejudice- Complaint ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
January 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) (As to all "DOE" Defendants ONLY. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
January 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
January 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Default Entered (as to Mr. Coffee House, Inc., a California Corporation; Jae Ryoung Kim, an individual ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
November 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
November 10, 2009 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.