Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Petrillo John, Mana Petrillo'S Pizza, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Erenstoft Sean G. Law Offices, against Trademark Business Solutions, Garcia Daniel Robert, Does 1 Through 50, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Helen I. Bendix presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHelen I. Bendix Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateNovember 02, 2009 |
CategoryContractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions218 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed - Other |
Case Cycle Time113 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Paper file imaged and destroyed Filed by Clerk |
|
November 17, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 1A, Matthew St. George, Presiding Judgment Debtor Examination Hrng - No appearance(s), off calendar Judge: Matthew St. George |
|
September 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 1A, Matthew St. George, Presiding Judgment Debtor Examination Hrng - Matter continued Judge: Matthew St. George |
|
July 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order to Appear for Examination Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
June 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Ex-Parte Application (TO ENTER JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
June 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 35, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding Exparte proceeding - Granted Judge: Daniel J. Buckley |
|
June 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Declaration (OF ATTORNEY SEAN G. ERENSTOFT IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
June 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Judgment (PURUSUANT TO STIPULATION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 18, Helen I. Bendix, Presiding Conference-Case Management - Case Dismissed/Disposed Judge: Helen I. Bendix |
|
March 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 18, Helen I. Bendix, Presiding Dismissal or Judgment to be filed - Case Dismissed/Disposed Judge: Helen I. Bendix |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.