Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Southern California Safe Company, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Masserat Sassan, against Does 1 To 30, Dejaun Jewelers, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Helen I. Bendix presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHelen I. Bendix Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 27, 2009 |
CategoryOther Contract (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed - Other |
Case Cycle Time62 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Paper file imaged and destroyed Filed by Clerk |
|
January 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 18, Helen I. Bendix, Presiding Court Order - Completed Judge: Helen I. Bendix |
|
December 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
Request and Entry of Dismissal (with Prejudice- Complaint Entire action of all parties and all causes of action. Court to retain jurisdiction per CCP 664.6 to enforce parties' settlement ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
December 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
November 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
November 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
October 27, 2009 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.