Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Century 21 Real Estate Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Hogan Bruce W. Law Offices Of, against Ricketts Carlos, Century 21 Broman Realty, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Robert S. Harrison presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert S. Harrison Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management146 days |
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2008 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions553 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time373 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2010 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 1A Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court |
|
July 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Century 21 Real Estate LLC (Plaintiff) |
|
July 30, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING ON APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION | |
July 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 1A Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination (Judgment Debtor Examination Hrng; Matter continued) - |
|
July 02, 2010 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE APPLICATION AND ORDER | |
May 28, 2010 | Docket Event | APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION | |
May 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
Application and Order for Appearance and Examination Filed by Century 21 Real Estate LLC (Plaintiff) |
|
September 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by Creditor |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.