Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Tadai Eiko, Tadai Randy, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Makarem & Associates Aplc, against Eli Lilly And Company, represented by , Pepper Hamilton Llp, Reed Smith Llp, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with William A. MacLaughlin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam A. MacLaughlin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management1230 days |
Filing DateOctober 11, 2007 |
CategoryProduct Liability (Not Asbestos Or Toxic/Environmental) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1485 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
VerdictDefendant |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeLegacy Judgment |
Case Cycle Time1485 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:OSC RE Dismissal William A. MacLaughlin 8:30 am | |
April 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2012-04-27 00:00:00 | |
April 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 89 (OSC RE Dismissal; Discharged) - (OSC RE Dismissal; Discharged) - |
|
April 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 89 (OSC RE Dismissal; Discharged) - |
|
March 13, 2012 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:MOTION - TAX COSTS William A. MacLaughlin 8:30 am | |
March 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 89 Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs (MOTION - TAX COSTS; Advanced to a Previous Date) - Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs (MOTION - TAX COSTS; Advanced to a Previous Date) - |
|
March 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 89 Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs (MOTION - TAX COSTS; Advanced to a Previous Date) - |
|
March 12, 2012 | Hearing | Calendaring:OSC RE Dismissal William A. MacLaughlin | |
March 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.