Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
22125 Roscoe Corp., Buchman Cary, Gardner Andrew, The Gardner Family Trust Of 1984, Topanga Facilities Llc, (total of 6) See All filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Dempsey Michael D. Esq., against Fenigstein & Kaufman, Fenigstein Sherwyn Jack, Kaufman Ron S., Tilles David F., represented by Sedgwick Detert Moran & Arnold, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with William A. MacLaughlin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam A. MacLaughlin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management116 days |
Filing DateJuly 20, 2007 |
CategoryLegal Malpractice (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time1057 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2010-06-14 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
June 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 89 (OSC RE Dismissal; Discharged) - |
|
June 02, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL | |
June 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
June 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 89 (OSC RE Dismissal; Not Held-Continued) - |
|
June 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2010-06-01 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
May 24, 2010 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 89 (OSC RE Dismissal; Not Held-Continued) - |
|
May 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2010-05-24 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.