Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hayun Noy, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Premier Toy Inc., Toy Premier, represented by Koo Benjamin Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Robert S. Harrison presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert S. Harrison Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management120 days |
Filing DateMarch 07, 2007 |
CategoryBreach Of Rental/Lease Contract (Not Unlawful Detainer Or Wrongful Eviction) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions442 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment By Court |
Case Cycle Time412 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 1A Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court |
|
November 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 1A Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination (Judgment Debtor Examination Hrng; Debtor Failed to Appear) - |
|
November 08, 2010 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Noy Hayun (Legacy Party) |
|
October 13, 2010 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
September 10, 2010 | Docket Event | APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION | |
September 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Application and Order for Appearance and Examination Filed by Noy Hayun (Legacy Party) |
|
February 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment Filed by Noy Hayun (Legacy Party) |
|
February 05, 2009 | Docket Event | ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGEMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.