Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Sieber Rita R., filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Lingenbrink David A. Esq., Morris Timothy J. Esq., against A California Paramedical Examiner Yet Un-, Allstate Life Insurance Company, Jones Otis W., Seress Kathy, represented by Even Randolph M. Esq., Karbelnig Steven D., Rittenburg Thomas Esq., Shaw Seyfarth, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Maureen Duffy-Lewis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaureen Duffy-Lewis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management140 days |
Filing DateDecember 11, 2006 |
CategoryInsurance Coverage (Not Complex) (General Jurisdiction) |
Time To Trial420 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions395 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time470 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department 38 (OSC RE Dismissal; OSC Discharged) - (OSC RE Dismissal; OSC Discharged) - |
|
April 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2008-04-04 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
April 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department 38 (OSC RE Dismissal; OSC Discharged) - |
|
March 25, 2008 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
March 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department 38 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Off Calendar) - Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Off Calendar) - |
|
March 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2008-03-06 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
March 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department 38 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Off Calendar) - |
|
March 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department 38 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Full Day of Trial Held) - Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Full Day of Trial Held) - |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.