Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Grenhill Investment Corporation, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Tekelec, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Terry Green presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTerry Green Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management122 days |
Filing DateMay 24, 2005 |
CategoryBreach Of Rental/Lease Contract (Not Unlawful Detainer Or Wrongful Eviction) (General Jurisdiction) |
Time To Trial391 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions577 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeJury Verdict |
Case Cycle Time570 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 21, 2007 | Docket Event | STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TEKELEC'S DEADLINE FOR FILING MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES | |
March 21, 2007 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
March 08, 2007 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department 96 Hearing on Motion for New Trial (Motion for New Trial; Off Calendar) - |
|
February 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department 96 Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees (Motion for Attorney Fees; Off Calendar) - |
|
February 22, 2007 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Grenhill Investment Corporation (Legacy Party) |
|
February 05, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PLAINTIFF AND, ETC | |
January 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
Ntc of Hrng sent w/Cert/Mailing Filed by Court |
|
January 31, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING OF MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.