Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mcmurray Elaine, filed a(n) Prdct Liablty (Not Asbes,Tox,Envir (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Paul Gary M. Esq., against Barr Laboratories Inc., Greenstone Ltd., Miles Linda, Pfizer Inc., Pharmacia & Upjohn Inc., (total of 12) See All represented by Betsy L. Katz, Shook Hardy & Bacon L.L.P., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Alice E. Altoon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlice E. Altoon Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 29, 2004 |
CategoryPrdct Liablty (Not Asbes,Tox,Envir (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2021 |
||
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeRemoval To Federal Court |
Case Cycle Time95 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 24, 2005 | Docket Event |
in Department 28, Alice E. Altoon, Presiding Non-Appearance (Case Review) (RE STAT OF FED CASE) - Advanced to a Previous Date Judge: Alice E. Altoon |
|
May 23, 2005 | Docket Event |
in Department 28, Alice E. Altoon, Presiding Court Order - Matter continued Judge: Alice E. Altoon |
|
May 17, 2005 | Hearing |
Declaration (RE REMOVAL STATUS OF CASE; ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
April 07, 2005 | Hearing |
Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 29, 2005 | Hearing |
Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by Clerk |
|
February 08, 2005 | Hearing |
Notice of Transfer (CONDITIONAL - TO MDL COURT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
November 23, 2004 | Docket Event |
in Department 28, FRANCES ROTHSCHILD, Presiding Initial Status Conference - Off Calendar Judge: FRANCES ROTHSCHILD |
|
November 22, 2004 | Hearing |
Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
November 01, 2004 | Hearing |
Ntc of Removal to Federal Court Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt |
|
October 29, 2004 | Hearing |
Notice (OF FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE RE RELATED CASES ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.