Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Motamedi Melissa, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Banayan K. & Associates, against Sorich Chris, Platinum Claim Services Inc., Carnegie Agency Inc., Bohman Carla, Millenium Insurance Company, (total of 6) See All represented by Toolen Robert L., Hogan Timothy J., Buckley Daniel J., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Morris B. Jones presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMorris B. Jones Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 08, 2001 |
CategoryContractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 07, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed - Other |
Case Cycle Time153 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 28, 2001 | Docket Event |
in Department 48, Morris B. Jones, Presiding Status Conference - Off Calendar Judge: Morris B. Jones |
|
November 08, 2001 | Hearing |
Partial Dismissal(not entire case) (Without prejudice, Cross-complaint filed by Millennium Insurance Co. on 8/10/01. ) Filed by Cross-Complainant |
|
October 24, 2001 | Hearing |
Request and Entry of Dismissal (***AS TO THE COMPLAINT W/ PREJUDICE*** ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
October 17, 2001 | Docket Event | Notice of Status Conference filed | |
August 10, 2001 | Hearing |
Answer to Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
August 10, 2001 | Hearing |
Cross-complaint Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant |
|
August 10, 2001 | Hearing |
Answer to Unverified Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
June 08, 2001 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.