Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Western Investment & Properties Co. Inc., Myong Ki Tae, Murakami Nancy, Kim Bang Ja, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Ralidis & Lee, against Teleking Corp., Opicom, Oh Tehan, Lee Jay, Opicom Inc., (total of 7) See All represented by James S. Hong & Associates, Bost Stephen A. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Alice E. Altoon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlice E. Altoon Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management265 days |
Filing DateDecember 05, 2000 |
CategoryContractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
VerdictDefendant |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeVerdict |
Case Cycle Time1246 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2007 | Hearing |
Notice (OF OSC RE DISMISSAL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
September 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department 28, Alice E. Altoon, Presiding OSC RE Dismissal (RE DISMISSAL) - Case Dismissed/Disposed Judge: Alice E. Altoon |
|
June 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department 28, Alice E. Altoon, Presiding OSC RE Dismissal - Matter continued Judge: Alice E. Altoon |
|
May 15, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department 28, Alice E. Altoon, Presiding OSC RE Dismissal - Matter continued Judge: Alice E. Altoon |
|
May 15, 2007 | Hearing |
Notice Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
April 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department 28, Alice E. Altoon, Presiding OSC RE Dismissal - Matter continued Judge: Alice E. Altoon |
|
March 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department 28, Alice E. Altoon, Presiding Final Status Conference - Advanced to a Previous Date Judge: Alice E. Altoon |
|
February 15, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department 78, William F. Fahey, Presiding Mandatory Settlement Conference - Completed Judge: William F. Fahey |
|
January 19, 2007 | Hearing |
Notice (OF MANDATORY SETTLMENT CONFERENCE ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
December 21, 2006 | Hearing |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.