Search anything: judges, parties, opposing counsel, motion types, legal issues

We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Malueaux VS Malueaux

Case Last Refreshed: 2 months, 1 week

Case Overview

On September 23, 2013 A Civil case was filed by Malueaux, Douglas Joseph, against Malueaux, Tina Janelle, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County.

Case Details

Case Number

(Subscribe to View)

Filing Date

September 23, 2013

Last Refreshed

Feb 23, 2021

Filing Location

Alameda County, CA

Category

Dissolution of Marriage

Practice Area

Family

Matter Type

Divorce,Separation

Case Cycle Time

1785 days

Verdict

Unclassified

Case Documents

Case History

Type Title - Description Documents
Docket Event Notice of Administrative Transfer of Case Within County (Same Jurisdiction) to Hayward Hall of Justi
Docket Event Returned Mail: Family Law Case Resolution Order mailed to Petitioner Filed
Docket Event Family Law Case Resolution Order Issued
Docket Event Hearing Reset to Family Centered Case Resolution Conference 10/20/2014 10:00 AM D- 302
Docket Event Returned Mail: Family Law Status Conference Order Filed
Docket Event Family Law Status Conference Order Issued
Docket Event Family Centered Case Resolution Conference 10/17/2014 09:00 AM D- 302
Docket Event Returned Mail: Family Law Status Conference Order Filed
Docket Event Family Law Status Conference Order Issued
Docket Event Family Law Status Conference 07/29/2014 09:13 AM D- 302
Showing See all events

Document Requested

Your request has been received. We will email you this document within 4 business hours.

You have used out of 0 document requests left today

Document Requested

You have exceeded your document request limit for today.

If you need immediate assistance, please contact [email protected]

Docket Refresh Requested

Your docket refresh request has been received. You will receive a notification when the docket is refreshed.

Docket Refresh Requested

A refresh is already in progress.

If you need immediate assistance, please contact [email protected]

For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.

Please wait a moment while we load this page.