Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Richard W. Nelson Jr, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by 22 Foxglove Lane, against Amy Nelson, represented by 22 Foxglove Lane, in the jurisdiction of Tolland County, CT, . Tolland County, CT Superior Courts with Jennifer Macierowski presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJennifer Macierowski Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 16, 2023 |
CategoryF00 - Family - Dissolution Of Marriage - C.G.S. Chapter 815J |
Last RefreshedMay 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTolland County, CT |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2023 | Resolution Plan Date | ||
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION | |
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 5/3/2023 HON JENNIFER MACIEROWSKI | |
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE RESULT: Order 5/3/2023 HON JENNIFER MACIEROWSKI | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE RESULT: Granted 4/6/2023 BY THE COURT | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 4/6/2023 BY THE COURT | |
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC COURT ORDERS | |
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATION OF WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - DISSOLUTION, LEGAL SEPARATION, OR ANNULMENT | |
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE | |
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATION - PUBLIC ASSISTANCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.