Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Ryefield Condominium Association, Inc., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Rosenberg & Rosenberg Pc, against Christina T Bolognese, Eastern Connecticut Imaging, Pc N K A Eastern Connecticut Imaging, Llc, Echn D B A Manchester Memorial Hospital & Rockville General Hospital, Ryefield Condominium Association, Inc., Wilmington Trust, National Association, Not In Its Individual Capacity, But Soley As Owner Trustee For Bravo Residential Funding Trust 2020-Rpl2, (total of 5) See All represented by 60-180 Old Town Road, Bendett & Mchugh Pc, Brock And Scott Pllc, in the jurisdiction of Tolland County, CT, . Tolland County, CT Superior Courts with Matthew D. Gordon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMatthew D. Gordon Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 21, 2023 |
CategoryP00 - Property - Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationTolland County, CT |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: March 21, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 20, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL UNDER PB 14-3 NOTICES SENT - COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL ONLY RESULT: HON MATTHEW GORDON | |
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE Appearance | |
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER Cert rejected. Not a mortgage foreclosure. RESULT: Rejected 4/17/2023 BY THE COURT | |
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE MEDIATION REQUEST/CERTIFICATE JD-CV-108 Filer Christina T Bolognese RESULT: Rejected 4/17/2023 BY THE CLERK | |
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE Filer Christina T Bolognese | |
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE Appearance | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE MEDIATION PLAINTIFF’S COMPLIANCE WITH SERVICE (NO DOCUMENT) | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.