Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Citibank, N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Rubin & Rothman Llc, against Kristen Phelps, represented by 80 Grand Ave, in the jurisdiction of Tolland County, CT, . Tolland County, CT Superior Courts ROCKVILLE JD.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 21, 2023 |
CategoryS00 - Small Claims - Small Claims - Collection - Credit Card (Original Owner) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationTolland County, CT |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseROCKVILLE JD |
ORDER RESULT: Order 5/1/2023 SAUNDRA BORGES, MAG
Date: May 01, 2023MILITARY AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 21, 2023EXECUTION ISSUED
Date: July 12, 2023SMALL CLAIMS WRIT AND NOTICE OF SUIT, JD-CV-40
Date: March 21, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF DEBT - SMALL CLAIMS
Date: March 21, 2023SMALL CLAIMS RETURN / STATEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: March 21, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event | EXECUTION ISSUED | |
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR EXECUTION FINANCIAL INSTITUTION - NATURAL PERSON/INDIVIDUAL (JD-CV-24) | |
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 5/1/2023 SAUNDRA BORGES, MAG | |
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT WITHOUT TRIAL FOR PLAINTIFF RESULT: SAUNDRA BORGES, MAG | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | MILITARY AFFIDAVIT | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS WRIT AND NOTICE OF SUIT, JD-CV-40 | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF DEBT - SMALL CLAIMS | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS RETURN / STATEMENT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.