Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Carolyn Vitelli, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Cicchiello & Cicchiello Llp, against Wei Ruling, represented by Tang And Maravelis Pc, in the jurisdiction of Tolland County, CT, . Tolland County, CT Superior Courts ROCKVILLE JD with Matthew D. Gordon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMatthew D. Gordon Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 21, 2023 |
CategoryT03 - Torts - Defective Premises - Private - Other |
Last RefreshedJanuary 13, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationTolland County, CT |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Filing Court HouseROCKVILLE JD |
MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE RESULT: Granted 1/11/2024 BY THE COURT
Date: January 10, 2024ORDER RESULT: Granted 1/11/2024 BY THE COURT
Date: January 11, 2024MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME RE DISCOVERY MOTION OR REQUEST PB CH13
Date: July 03, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
September 18, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
September 17, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
September 11, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
September 10, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
September 03, 2024 | Remote Trial Management Conference | ||
July 12, 2024 | Remote Pretrial Conference | ||
January 12, 2024 | Remote Pretrial Conference | ||
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 1/11/2024 BY THE COURT | |
January 10, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE RESULT: Granted 1/11/2024 BY THE COURT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.