Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Naor Levi, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Romano Parker & Associates, against List N Show, Llc, Serenity Post Jones, represented by Boyle Shaughnessy Law Pc, Diana Conti & Tunila, in the jurisdiction of Tolland County, CT, . Tolland County, CT Superior Courts ROCKVILLE JD with Matthew D. Gordon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMatthew D. Gordon Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 20, 2023 |
CategoryC90 - Contracts - All Other |
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationTolland County, CT |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseROCKVILLE JD |
ORDER RESULT: Granted 7/19/2023 BY THE COURT
Date: July 19, 2023REPLY TO SPECIAL DEFENSE
Date: September 19, 2023MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE RESULT: Granted 7/19/2023 BY THE COURT
Date: July 19, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 08, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
October 04, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
October 03, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
October 02, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
October 01, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
September 27, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
September 26, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
September 25, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
September 24, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
September 16, 2024 | Remote Trial Management Conference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.