Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Brenda Benoit, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Cicchiello & Cicchiello Llp, against Metropolitan Property And Casualty Insurance Co., Thomas Dorsey, represented by 222 West Main Street, Mcmanus Leo J Law Offices Of, in the jurisdiction of Tolland County, CT, . Tolland County, CT Superior Courts with Donna M. Wilkerson Brillant presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDonna M. Wilkerson Brillant Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 15, 2023 |
CategoryV01 - Vehicular - Motor Vehicles - Driver And/Or Passenger(S) Vs. Driver(S) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationTolland County, CT |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
ORDER Judgment of Nonsuit RESULT: Order 7/5/2023 HON MATTHEW GORDON
Date: July 05, 2023ORDER RESULT: Off 7/6/2023 HON DONNA WILKERSON BRILLANT
Date: July 06, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Off 7/6/2023 HON DONNA WILKERSON BRILLANT | |
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Withdrawn 7/6/2023 HON DONNA WILKERSON BRILLANT | |
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER Judgment of Nonsuit RESULT: Order 7/5/2023 HON MATTHEW GORDON | |
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF NONSUIT BEFORE TRIAL COMMENCED RESULT: HON MATTHEW GORDON | |
June 26, 2023 | Short Calendar SC-12 #005 | ||
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME RE DISCOVERY MOTION OR REQUEST PB CH13 RESULT: Off 7/6/2023 HON DONNA WILKERSON BRILLANT | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION motion for ext of time | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME RE DISCOVERY MOTION OR REQUEST PB CH13 RESULT: Withdrawn 7/6/2023 HON DONNA WILKERSON BRILLANT | |
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE d&p to plaintiff | |
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE Notice of Service of Discovery as to Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Co. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.