Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Jennifer Tracy, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Kenworthy Christopher J Law Office Of Ll, against Nicholas Dulude, Patrick J. Dulude, represented by Gorman And Shea Law Offices Of, in the jurisdiction of Tolland County, CT, . Tolland County, CT Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 14, 2023 |
CategoryV01 - Vehicular - Motor Vehicles - Driver And/Or Passenger(S) Vs. Driver(S) |
Last RefreshedMarch 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationTolland County, CT |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Notice of Compliance of Nicholas Dulude
Date: May 24, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: March 14, 2023SUMMONS
Date: March 14, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: March 14, 2023APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: March 21, 2023NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Notice of Compliance of Patrick Dulude
Date: May 24, 2023ORDER RESULT: Accepted 5/4/2023 BY THE COURT
Date: May 04, 2023CLAIM FOR JURY OF 6
Date: July 12, 2023ANSWER
Date: July 10, 2023CERTIFICATE OF CLOSED PLEADINGS AND CLAIM FOR TRIAL LIST
Date: July 14, 2023OFFER OF COMPROMISE
Date: August 31, 2023WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION
Date: February 02, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
March 27, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
March 26, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
March 20, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
March 19, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
March 11, 2024 | Remote Trial Management Conference | ||
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION | |
January 26, 2024 | Remote Pretrial Conference | ||
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event | OFFER OF COMPROMISE | |
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF CLOSED PLEADINGS AND CLAIM FOR TRIAL LIST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.