Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Sara Greeley, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Balskus & Johnston Llc, against Prudence Doty, represented by Beck & Eldergill, in the jurisdiction of Tolland County, CT, . Tolland County, CT Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 14, 2023 |
CategoryP10 - Property - Partition |
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTolland County, CT |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
This complaint is a legal document filed by the Plaintiff, Sara Greeley, against the Defendant, Prudence Doty. The complaint states that both parties are co-owners of a property located at 37 Hublard Drive in Vernon, CT. They hold the property as ten...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 14, 2023 | Remote Status Conference | ||
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF COUNTERCLAIM | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Rejected 8/1/2023 BY THE COURT | |
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION RESULT: Rejected 8/1/2023 BY THE COURT | |
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM RESULT: Withdrawn 8/1/2023 BY THE DEFENDANT | |
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE Appearance | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE Prudence Doty | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE | |
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.