Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Homestead Fuel Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Reveley William G. & Associates Llc, against Alex R Macomber, Victoria M Macomber, represented by 18 Arnold Dr, in the jurisdiction of Tolland County, CT, . Tolland County, CT Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 14, 2023 |
CategoryS25 - Small Claims - Small Claims - Contract - Other |
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationTolland County, CT |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
BILL OF COSTS RESULT: Granted 6/15/2023 BY THE CLERK
Date: May 31, 2023EXECUTION ISSUED
Date: August 10, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT - SMALL CLAIMS | |
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | EXECUTION ISSUED | |
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR EXECUTION FINANCIAL INSTITUTION - NATURAL PERSON/INDIVIDUAL (JD-CV-24) RESULT: Granted 8/10/2023 BY THE CLERK | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 6/15/2023 BY THE CLERK | |
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event | BILL OF COSTS RESULT: Granted 6/15/2023 BY THE CLERK | |
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 5/1/2023 SAUNDRA BORGES, MAG | |
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT WITHOUT TRIAL FOR PLAINTIFF RESULT: SAUNDRA BORGES, MAG | |
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event | MILITARY AFFIDAVIT | |
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS WRIT AND NOTICE OF SUIT, JD-CV-40 | |
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.