Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Trinks Brothers Oil Company Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Reveley William G. & Associates Llc, against Julie L Bendza, Toren K Bull, represented by 117 Loehr Road, in the jurisdiction of Tolland County, CT, . Tolland County, CT Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 14, 2023 |
CategoryS25 - Small Claims - Small Claims - Contract - Other |
Last RefreshedJanuary 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationTolland County, CT |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT - SMALL CLAIMS
Date: May 18, 2023ORDER RESULT: Order 5/1/2023 SAUNDRA BORGES, MAG
Date: May 01, 2023MILITARY AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 13, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT - SMALL CLAIMS | |
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 5/1/2023 SAUNDRA BORGES, MAG | |
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT WITHOUT TRIAL FOR PLAINTIFF RESULT: SAUNDRA BORGES, MAG | |
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event | MILITARY AFFIDAVIT | |
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS | |
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF DEBT - SMALL CLAIMS | |
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | MILITARY AFFIDAVIT | |
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | CONTINUATION OF PARTIES | |
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS WRIT AND NOTICE OF SUIT, JD-CV-40 | |
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS RETURN / STATEMENT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.