Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Bank Of America, N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Rubin & Rothman Llc, against Ahmad Moazzam, represented by Matthew Leo Gustaitis, in the jurisdiction of Tolland County, CT, . Tolland County, CT Superior Courts with Matthew D. Gordon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMatthew D. Gordon Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 13, 2023 |
CategoryC40 - Contracts - Collections |
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationTolland County, CT |
Matter TypeCollections |
EXECUTION ISSUED
Date: November 20, 2023APPLICATION FOR EXECUTION FINANCIAL INSTITUTION - NATURAL PERSON/INDIVIDUAL (JD-CV-24)
Date: November 20, 2023MILITARY AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 18, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 20, 2023 | Docket Event | EXECUTION ISSUED | |
November 20, 2023 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR EXECUTION FINANCIAL INSTITUTION - NATURAL PERSON/INDIVIDUAL (JD-CV-24) | |
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 6/13/2023 HON MATTHEW GORDON | |
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT BY STIPULATION BEFORE TRIAL COMMENCED RESULT: HON MATTHEW GORDON | |
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event | MILITARY AFFIDAVIT | |
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR JUDGMENT IN ACCORDANCE WITH STIPULATION RESULT: Granted 6/13/2023 HON MATTHEW GORDON | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE Appearance | |
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.