Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
John Slavis, Stephen Walburn, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Kenneth P Namnoum Jr, against Erika Fitzin, Karen Fitzin, represented by Mcmanus Dennis M Law Office Of, in the jurisdiction of Tolland County, CT, . Tolland County, CT Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 09, 2023 |
CategoryV01 - Vehicular - Motor Vehicles - Driver And/Or Passenger(S) Vs. Driver(S) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationTolland County, CT |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION
Date: July 19, 2023WITHDRAWAL IN PART
Date: July 12, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
December 18, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
December 17, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
December 11, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
December 10, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
December 02, 2024 | Remote Trial Management Conference | ||
November 18, 2024 | Remote Pretrial Conference | ||
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION | |
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL IN PART | |
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Erika Fitzin |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.