Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Mill City Mortgage Loan Trust 2021-Nmr1, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Bendett & Mchugh Pc, Brock And Scott Pllc, against Brenda L Bouchard, Connecticut Housing Finance Authority, Credit Acceptance Corporation, Fcv Tool Supply Llc, John W. Stevens Dds Fka John W. Stevens Dds, (total of 9) See All represented by Conn Housing Finance Authority, John Andrew Kissel, in the jurisdiction of Tolland County, CT, . Tolland County, CT Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 09, 2023 |
CategoryP00 - Property - Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedApril 17, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationTolland County, CT |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: March 09, 2023MOTION FOR DEFAULT-FAILURE TO PLEAD RESULT: Granted 8/2/2023 BY THE CLERK
Date: July 25, 2023MOTION FOR SUPPLEMENTAL JUDGMENT
Date: March 28, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2024 | Short Calendar SC-02 #003 | ||
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUPPLEMENTAL JUDGMENT | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | COMMITTEE DEED | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/14/2024 HON MOIRA BUCKLEY | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE COMMITTEE-MOTION FOR ADVICE-JD-CV-100 RESULT: Granted 3/14/2024 HON MOIRA BUCKLEY | |
February 08, 2024 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SALE -NO PROCEEDS JD-CV-97 | |
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event | BILL OF COSTS FILED FOR TAXATION BY CLERK - PB SEC 18-5 bill of cost 15 Cherry Valley Rd 23-17309 | |
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | COMMITTEE DEED | |
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 1/2/2024 HON MOIRA BUCKLEY | |
December 20, 2023 | Docket Event | COMMITTEE REPORT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.