Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Mortgage Assets Management, Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Bendett & Mchugh Pc, Brock And Scott Pllc, against Keith Simmons Heir And Or Beneficiary Of Kenneth Simmons, Deceased, Kenneth Simmons The Unknown Heirs And Or Beneficiaries Of The Estate Of, Kris Simmons Heir And Or Beneficiary Of Kenneth Simmons, Deceased, Lisa Simmons Aka Lisa Caputo, Heir And Or Beneficiary Of Kenneth Simmons, Deceased, Secretary Of Housing And Urban Development, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Tolland County, CT, . Tolland County, CT Superior Courts with Matthew D. Gordon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMatthew D. Gordon Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 08, 2023 |
CategoryP00 - Property - Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedFebruary 07, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationTolland County, CT |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
MILITARY AFFIDAVIT Lisa Simmons a/k/a Lisa Caputo
Date: June 02, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 7/12/2023 HON MATTHEW GORDON
Date: July 12, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF DEBT
Date: June 02, 2023MILITARY AFFIDAVIT Kris Simmons
Date: June 02, 2023RETURN OF SALE -NO PROCEEDS JD-CV-97
Date: November 07, 2023SUPPLEMENTAL RETURN
Date: May 23, 2023COMMITTEE DEED
Date: October 02, 2023APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: July 17, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE WITH EMAP
Date: May 02, 2023ORDER RESULT: Continuance 7/3/2023 HON DONNA WILKERSON BRILLANT
Date: July 03, 2023SUMMONS
Date: March 08, 2023MILITARY AFFIDAVIT Lisa Simmons a/k/a Lisa Caputo
Date: July 07, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: March 08, 2023ADDITIONAL PARTIES PAGE
Date: March 08, 2023FORECLOSURE WORKSHEET JD-CV-77
Date: June 02, 2023OATH OF APPRAISERS
Date: June 02, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 5/19/2023 HON MATTHEW GORDON
Date: May 19, 2023NOTICE Notice of Filing Return of Appraisal
Date: September 06, 2023NOTICE OF JUDGMENT – CERTIFIED/SERVED
Date: July 18, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: March 08, 2023AFFIDAVIT RE: ATTORNEY/COUNSEL FEES
Date: September 19, 2023ORDER RESULT: Order 10/2/2023 HON MOIRA BUCKLEY
Date: October 02, 2023APPRAISAL
Date: September 06, 2023MILITARY AFFIDAVIT Kris Simmons
Date: July 07, 2023OATH OF APPRAISERS
Date: September 06, 2023COMMITTEE REPORT
Date: September 19, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 6/1/2023 BY THE CLERK
Date: June 01, 2023AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: July 07, 2023APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: August 16, 2023APPRAISAL
Date: June 02, 2023MILITARY AFFIDAVIT Keith Simmons
Date: July 07, 2023AFFIDAVIT RE: ATTORNEY/COUNSEL FEES
Date: June 02, 2023MILITARY AFFIDAVIT Keith Simmons
Date: June 02, 2023RETURN OF NOTICE RE JUDGMENT OR ORDER
Date: August 28, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 05, 2024 | Short Calendar SC-02 #001 | ||
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUPPLEMENTAL JUDGMENT MOTION FOR SUPPLEMENTAL JUDGMENT 228 West Main Street 23-20232 | |
January 10, 2024 | Docket Event | BILL OF COSTS FILED FOR TAXATION BY CLERK - PB SEC 18-5 bill of cost 228 West Main st 23-20232 | |
November 16, 2023 | Docket Event | ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSURE OF FORECLOSURE BY SALE MATTER PENDING ENTRY OF FINAL DISPOSITION RESULT: BY THE COURT | |
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SALE -NO PROCEEDS JD-CV-97 | |
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event | COMMITTEE DEED | |
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 10/2/2023 HON MOIRA BUCKLEY | |
September 19, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF COMMITTEE SALE/DEED/REPORT/FEES AND EXPENSES/APPRAISER’S FEES JD-CV-99 RESULT: Order 10/2/2023 HON MOIRA BUCKLEY | |
September 19, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT RE: ATTORNEY/COUNSEL FEES | |
September 19, 2023 | Docket Event | COMMITTEE REPORT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.